THE KEYS COLLEGE OF RADIONICS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Initiating, educating and training students, operations and instructions in relation to radionic practise and to issue diploma's.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 January 1990: Standard registration
- 15 July 2022: Removed (Ceased to be charitable)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.61k | £2.23k | £948 | £4.73k | £3.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.46k | £6.11k | £3.01k | £4.33k | £5.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 25 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM ANDARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH AUGUST 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3RD OCTOBER 1985 AND 2ND DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF ADUCATION IN THE THEORIES AND TECHNIQUES OF RADIONIC THERAPY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window