Accounts and annual returns CHAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 802694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 05 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 17 April 2023 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 02 April 2022 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 02 April 2022 425 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required