CHAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help to poor family - Poor Bride - Bar Mitzva. Helping people with debts, health problems. Comforting widows and distressed divorcees. Distributing money through rallies to poor institutions and needy people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Israel
Governance
- 12 February 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GINETTE ESTELLE SILBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHAYA SCHEINDEL NATALIE STERN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.73k | £9.76k | £17.62k | £14.60k | £8.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.89k | £13.59k | £11.25k | £18.46k | £15.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 02 April 2022 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 02 April 2022 | 425 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE GIVING OF AND AFFORDING ASSISTANCE TO LARGE NEEDY FAMILIES AND NEEDY BRIDES. (II) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF THE JEWISH FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX PRACTICE. (III) TO ADVANCE ORTHODOX JEWISH EDUCATION. (IV) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 RODBOROUGH ROAD
LONDON
NW11 8SA
- Phone:
- 02084557244
- Email:
- GINSILBER@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window