AYLESHAM YOUTH AND LEISURE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting young people in the Aylesham Ward and District in the Dover District Area. Primarily at the local Youth Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 12 July 1990: Standard registration
- 17 May 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 17 May 2013: Funds transferred to 1151452 SUPPORTING AYLESHAM YOUTH
- AYLESHAM YOUTH CLUB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 30/03/2011 | 30/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.56k | £0 | £0 | £3.00k | £4.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £4.65k | £2.50k | £4.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2012 | 12 April 2013 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2011 | 20 April 2012 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 15 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window