Accounts and annual returns NORTH WEST KENT COLLEGE TRAINING TRUST

Charity number: 802702
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2014 08 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 22 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2013 12 March 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 24 December 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2012 24 July 2013 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 27 December 2012 On Time