SHALOM EMPLOYMENT ACTION CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and training of people in the London Borough of Newham and neighbouring boroughs without distinction of sex, race, disability or sexual orientation or political, religious or other conictions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newham
Governance
- 14 March 1990: Standard registration
- 04 May 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SEAC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £317.12k | £272.91k | £221.26k | £148.44k | £67.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £334.82k | £297.53k | £720.43k | £229.28k | £80.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 22 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 29 April 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 20 April 2015 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 29 April 2015 | 180 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 23 March 2015 | 508 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 18 December 2013 | 48 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX RACE DISABILITY OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CONICTIONS.
Area of benefit
NEWHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window