REVOLUTION IN KINDNESS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Revolution in Kindness is committed to supporting innovative global projects working in the areas of human rights, environmental & animal protection, which provide support or services to people of all faiths or no faith. We support organisations at the forefront of social and environmental change which raise awareness & promote positive change. We DO NOT: Accept unsolicited applications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 February 1990: Standard registration
- 09 June 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- IASIS (Working name)
- THE BODY SHOP FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £926.54k | £10.14k | £0 | £552 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £782.19k | £718.77k | £53.00k | £2.94k | £2.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £586.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £338.62k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £548.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £233.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £171.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £377.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 03 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 OCT 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. (II) THE PROMOTION, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (III) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE PROVIDED THAT SUCH FACILITIES ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (IV) THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window