THE FRIENDS OF TRUMPS GREEN COUNTY INFANT SCHOOL, VIRGINIA WATER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils at Trumps Green Infant School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 April 1990: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF TRUMPS GREEN COUNTY FIRST SCHOOL, VIRGINIA WATER (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ekaterina Sokolova | Chair | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Turton | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Ellen Melia | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nyomi Rowsell | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jawad Ali | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Morris | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.89k | £5.78k | £14.50k | £15.10k | £16.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.69k | £4.18k | £21.50k | £5.71k | £14.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND JANURAY 1990, AS AMENDED 8TH FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
EDUCATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRUMPS GREEN INFANT SCHOOL
CROWN ROAD
VIRGINIA WATER
GU25 4HD
- Phone:
- 01344843928
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window