Financial history HENLOW WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 802795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £895 £1.50k £2.97k £3.22k £4.03k
Total expenditure £906 £943 £3.28k £2.99k £3.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A