South Thames Colleges Group Educational Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to young people to help them get the most from their education and allow them to take advantage of educational opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 February 1990: Standard registration
- KCFE CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- SOUTH THAMES COLLEGES GROUP CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- STCG CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- KINGSTON COLLEGE OF FURTHER EDUCATION CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Elizabeth Bell | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Helen Katharine Cavanagh | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Chris Stead | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Julia Louise Murphy | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
PETER MAYHEW-SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JOSEPHINE ELAINE WACKETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr JANIS BRUMWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £6.36k | £4.53k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £72 | £3.67k | £96 | £271 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH JANUARY 1990 as amended on 24 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TRAINING GENERALLY IN ENGLAND AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THAT GENERALITY) WITHIN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES AND ENVIRONS FOR ALL THOSE RESORTING TO THE TRUST FUND HELD BY THE TRUSTEES FOR ACADEMIC VOCATIONAL AND PREVOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingston College
Kingston Hall Road
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT1 2AQ
- Phone:
- 020 8546 2151
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window