GRANDPARENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 February 1990: Standard registration
- 04 February 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 February 2006: Funds transferred to 1105977 THE GRANDPARENTS' ASSOCIATION
- GRANDPARENTS' FEDERATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.48k | £235.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.03k | £174.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 23 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 29 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 29 July 2005 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 08 March 2005 | 36 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 29TH JANUARY 1990, 12TH OCTOBER 1990, 14 APRIL 1994, 13 NOVEMBER 1997, AND 2 NOVEMBER 1998, 24 MAY 2000, AND 31ST JULY 2002
Charitable objects
THE FEDERATION IS ESTABLISHED PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF GRANDPARENTS WHO ARE SEPARATED FROM THEIR YOUNG RELATIVES, TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ORDER TO PREVENT THE DIFFICULTIES THAT CAUSE THE BREAKDOWN AND CONTINUED SEPARATION OF THOSE PERSONS, TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT GRANDPARENTS WHO ARE CARING FOR THEIR GRANDCHILDREN BECAUSE OF A BREAKDOWN AND SEPARATION OF THE FAMILY AND TO OTHER WISE ASSIST, HELP AND EDUCATE GRANDPARENTS GENERALLY BY WHATEVER MEANS THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window