Financial history THE LALONDE TRUST

Charity number: 802863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £125.41k £14.74k £24.14k £17.80k £12.62k
Total expenditure £23.62k £31.18k £19.20k £15.35k £59.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A