ERITREAN COMMUNITY IN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes including education/training accommodation, employment, health, community development, tackle poverty and similar services to all ages and gender.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,698 from 2 government contract(s) and £57,444 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 April 1990: Standard registration
- ECUK (ALL IN CAPITAL LETTERS) (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lwam Haile | Chair | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Habtegiorgis Aklilu | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Medhane | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mesghenet Seyoum Adhanom | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eyob Ghebremichael | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawit Welderufael | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lula Ghebretinsae | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.75k | £70.51k | £96.78k | £137.00k | £84.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.14k | £67.45k | £87.99k | £94.00k | £81.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.70k | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.00k | £43.79k | £37.00k | £37.00k | £57.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/04/1989 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2012 as amended on 14 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR THE ERITREAN COMMUNITY BY RELIEVING POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROVIDING OR ASSISING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, IN THE INTERES OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLLOWAY NEIGHBOURHOOD GROUP
84 MAYTON STREET
LONDON
N7 6QT
- Phone:
- 020777007995
- Email:
- office@ericomuk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window