TACT EDUCATION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
STUDENT GRANTS FOR ACTORS' CHILDREN ON ARTS COURSES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 March 1990: Standard registration
- 01 October 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 01 October 2014: Funds transferred to 206809 THE ACTORS' CHILDREN'S TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.98k | £24.51k | £24.37k | £24.84k | £12.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.22k | £28.63k | £13.88k | £10.26k | £12.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 25 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 09 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 19 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 01 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 28 November 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND JANUARY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14TH JULY 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS PARTICULARLY FOR CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OF THE THEATRICAL PROFESSION BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL GRANTS AND ALLOWANCES OF ALL KINDS IN RELATION TO THE EDUCATION OF BENEFICIARIES, WHETHER FOR TUITION FEES OR GENERAL SUBSISTENCE ALLOWANCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window