Governing document THE AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE
Charity Number: 802887
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 1989 AMENDED 15 MARCH 1990, 18 OCTOBER 1996, 10 MAY 2001 AND 15TH MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE COMMUNICATION OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND BY THE INSTRUCTION OF CHRISTIANS IN CHRISTIAN LIFE AND SERVICE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.