THE HADDENHAM EQUIPMENT AND RESUSCITATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HEART exists to support the communities of Haddenham, Aldreth, Wilburton and Stretham by providing mobility equipment and services (e.g. wheelchairs, lifelines etc.) to aid their daily activities. Requests are directed either to Trustees or through the local GP Surgery. Equipment is provided free of charge. Activities include purchase, maintenance, loan and receipt back of equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 16 May 1990: Standard registration
- HEART (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynn Nangle | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Kirby | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Clarke | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALISON GRAYLAND | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR ALAN YARROW | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ASTRID GOLDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.95k | £3.07k | £4.26k | £3.37k | £1.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.50k | £2.77k | £2.77k | £2.97k | £2.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16TH OCTOBER 1989, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 30 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH IN THE VILLAGES OF HADDENHAM, ALDRETH, STRETHAM AND WILBURTON (HEREINAFTER CALLED ' THE AREA OF BENEFIT') IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY SUPPLIED BY THE LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
VILLAGES OF HADDENHAM, ALDRETH STRETHAM AND WILBURTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Nelsons Lane
Haddenham
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB6 3UH
- Phone:
- 01353741520
- Email:
- clarkeam22@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window