FRIENDS OF BATTERSEA PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FoBP seeks to act for the public benefit to secure the preservation, protection and improvement of the Park as a place of historic and ecological interest, beauty, rest and recreation; to promote the conservation of the plant, animal and bird life of the Park and the Park as a semi-natural habitat for wildlife; and to inform the public of the history, natural history and other aspects of the Park.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 22 February 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin James Colin Graham | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Bock | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miles Kerstein | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Milne | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Buckle | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Briony Newman | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fenella Barber | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Lyon-Smith | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Russell Coffey | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Flook | Trustee | 17 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
INGE DARLING | Trustee | 17 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETA-MAY LAW | Trustee | 08 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNABEL BARHAM STEIN | Trustee | 08 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES RADCLIFFE OBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY ORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.40k | £17.93k | £19.17k | £30.93k | £39.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.63k | £15.39k | £13.24k | £29.10k | £17.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/03/1988 AS AMENDED ON 23/11/1989 AS AMENDED ON 04/07/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF BATTERSEA PARK AS A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ECOLOGICAL INTEREST, BEAUTY, REST AND RECREATION; TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL PLANT, ANIMAL AND BIRD LIFE AT THE PAK AND IN PARTICULAR, ITS RETENTION AS A SEMI-NATURAL HABITANT FOR WILD LIFE; AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND OTHER ASPECTS OF THE PARK.
Area of benefit
BATTERSEA PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Vicarage Crescent
LONDON
SW11 3LP
- Phone:
- 020 7622 2937
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window