LIBERTY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (LORDSWOOD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We continue to lift up the Name of Jesus Christ. All Nations join us in worshipping Him on Sundays at 11am. Other activities include our Youth Club which reopens to the public during March 2018 once the club facility is completed. Our Soup Kitchen is open every Saturday at 10am for all who seek to have a chat and warm drink.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 28 February 1990: Standard registration
- LORDSWOOD FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- THE LORDSWOOD FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Agatha Benyera Mararike | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
EBENEZER PHILLIPS | Trustee | 15 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE CARNEGIE-RILEY | Trustee | 29 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.33k | £14.26k | £10.27k | £42.74k | £20.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.95k | £7.63k | £5.76k | £22.62k | £53.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AMENDED 16TH JANUARY 1990 AND 8 JANUARY 2011.
Charitable objects
THE FELLOWSHIP IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND WORSHIP OF GOD; PROVIDING THE SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL NEEDS OF ALL AGES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fellowship Walk
Kestrel Road
Lordswood
CHATHAM
ME5 8TH
- Phone:
- 01634869822
- Email:
- lcftrustees@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window