1ST BROADBRIDGE HEATH SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE 1ST BROADBRIDGE HEATH SCOUT GROUP IS IN OPERATION TO PROVIDE ACCESS FOR ALL INTERESTED CHILDREN IN THE AREA TO THE RANGE OF ACTIVITIES PROVIDED BY THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION. IN ORDER TO MAINTAIN A PROGRAMME OF EVENTS AND TO UPKEEP OUR PREMISES WE UNDERTAKE SEVERAL FUNDRAISING EVENTS DURING THE YEAR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 February 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Firth | Chair | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Mursell | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven James Wilson | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alice Medley | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Albert Seden Smith | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smith | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Mursell | Trustee | 11 May 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.77k | £37.75k | £18.65k | £11.13k | £16.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.60k | £25.44k | £7.76k | £9.93k | £42.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £34.17k | £12.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED THE 4TH JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED 19TH JULY 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NTO DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7A Courtlands
Southwater
HORSHAM
West Sussex
RH13 9AD
- Phone:
- 01403269094
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window