Accounts and annual returns THE FOUNDATION FOR INTERNATIONAL ENVIRONMENTAL LAW AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 802934
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 26 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 26 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 30 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 29 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 03 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 01 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 14 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 14 December 2012 On Time