ISLE OF DOGS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is now dormant. Grant-Making charity serving the wards of Millwall, Blackwall, Limehouse, East India & Lansbury. Bromley By Bow and Mile End East in the London Borough of Tower Hamlets. IDCF also delivers a range of employment relating programmes for residents across the Borough.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 05 March 1990: Standard registration
- 27 October 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 27 October 2016: Funds transferred to 1147789 EAST END COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
- ISLE OF DOGS COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.46m | £2.10m | £17.79k | £0 | £2.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.24m | £2.05m | £17.79k | £551.96k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £509.88k | £961.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £744.36k | £855.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £193.02k | £265.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £10.00k | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.19m | £1.89m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.58k | £83.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £18.79k | £40.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 25 August 2016 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 06 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 01 September 2014 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH JANUARY 1990, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED THE 7TH JUNE 1995 AND 16 OCTOBER 2009.
Charitable objects
(A) (I) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN THE MILLWALL AND BLACKWALL WARDS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS (THE ORIGINAL AREA OF BENEFIT); (II) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN ALL THE OTHER WARDS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS (THE EXTENDED AREA OF BENEFIT) (III) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED AREA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS IN LIFE (IV) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING (INCLUDING TRAINING IN EMPLOYMENT SKILLS) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED AREAS; (V) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS; (VI) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF NEEDY PERSONS OR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HANDICAP WITHIN THE ABOVE-MENTIONED AREA ON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS. (VII) TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OR OF AN APPRECIABLY IMPORTANT CLASS OF THE COMMUNITY CONSISTING OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ABOVE MENTIONED AREA; (VIII) TO MAKE CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE CHARITIES AID FOUNDATION OR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE TRUSTS, ASSOCIATIONS, BODIES OR CORPORATIONS FROM TIME TO TIME IN EXISTENCE HAVING AS, OR AMONG, THEIR OBJECTS THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OR POVERTY, THE PROVISION OR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING (INCLUDING TRAINING IN EMPLOYMENT SKILLS) THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE ARTS AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES AND THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR THE NEEDY AND PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED
Area of benefit
MILLWALL AND BLACKWALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window