THE MEDWAY EDUCATION BUSINESS PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MEBP's aim is to develop the employability skills of all Medway's young people, to prepare them for work and citizenship, and in so doing improve the economy in Medway. MEBP does this by engaging employers and other adults to support a wide range of activities, in the classroom and workplace, for children of all ages but concentrating on 14 - 19 year olds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 14 March 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Roger Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Scott John Atkinson | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Mace Harvey | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Alexander Ratcliff | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.13k | £105.40k | £67.90k | £135.30k | £135.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.56k | £125.13k | £76.47k | £103.32k | £121.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £34.85k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 02 June 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 02 June 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO EQUIPPING THEM FOR EMPLOYMENT AND FACILITATING THEIR OBTAINING WORK IN INDUSTRY, COMMERCE AND THE PROFESSIONS AND TO THAT END TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUCLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT HARMONIOUS RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS, THEIR PARENTS, INDUSTRY, COMMERCE AND THE PROFESSIONALS, LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITIES, SCHOOLS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Phinia Delphi Uk Ltd
Courteney Road
GILLINGHAM
Kent
ME8 0RU
- Phone:
- 01634874288
- Email:
- toni@mebp.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window