LATIN AMERICAN ELDERLY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LAEP enables Latin American people aged over 50 years to lead dignified and fulfilling lives by way of providing a weekly activity program, participating in stimulating activities as well as providing information on welfare subjects, and a befriending volunteer service to support housebound/hospitalised beneficiaries. Spanish/Portuguese speakers from other countries are welcome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 April 1990: Standard registration
- L A E P (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HENNA DIAZ | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARIA ZAPATA | Trustee | 06 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
CECILIA HERRERA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAISY PENIDO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLADYS MOTTOA REYES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAMIRO URBANO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.07k | £8.78k | £5.63k | £3.33k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.20k | £15.61k | £3.73k | £4.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1559 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1559 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JANUARY 1990 AS AMENDED 9 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON AND IN PARTICULAR ELDERLY PERSONS OF LATIN AMERICAN DESCENT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON IN PARTICULAR AMONG ELDERLY PERSONS OF LATIN AMERICAN DESCENT. (C) TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS IN LONDON BY ENDEAVOURING TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE AND ENCOURAGING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLAREMONT
24-27 WHITE LION STREET
LONDON
N1 9PD
- Phone:
- 02078333730
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window