THE CD FAMILY SUPPORT GROUP
Charity number: 802964
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Disability
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
- Haringey
Governance
Registration history:
- 09 March 1990: Standard registration
- 22 March 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- THE CP FAMILY SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 17 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH FEBRUARY 1990 AS AMENDED 10TH MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH CEREBRAL PALSY OR OTHER DISABILITIES IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window