COUNCIL OF PROFESSORS AND HEADS OF COMPUTING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Council are to advance public education in the core subject of computer science and in the wider context of computing and its applications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 March 1990: Standard registration
- C P H C (Working name)
- CONFERENCE OF PROFESSORS AND HEADS OF COMPUTING (Previous name)
- CONFERENCE OF PROFESSORS OF COMPUTER SCIENCE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Kevin Fraser Chalmers | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Paul Michael Sant | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Steven Bradley | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Danino | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor James Davenport | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Rob Aspin | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.25k | £46.89k | £48.11k | £55.95k | £53.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.02k | £34.10k | £85.45k | £55.99k | £59.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 JULY 1988 AS AMENDED 3RD JULY 1989, 7 JULY 1993, 11 APRIL 2000, 15 APRIL 2003, 11 APRIL 2006, 2 APRIL 2008 AND 13 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN COMPUTER SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Newbridge Square
Swindon
SN1 1BY
- Phone:
- 01793417417
- Email:
- cphc@bcs.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window