ESHER CHURCH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Esher Church School Association is the Parents' Association at Esher Church School. We have two main aims within the ECSA; one is to raise funds for the school, the other is to have a good time raising these funds. The ECSA has funded small and large projects, ranging from the climbing frame in Reception to the swimming pool, computers for the computer suite and new books for the library.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 March 1990: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 August 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melanie Stephens | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Pilz | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenni Baldwin | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Wright | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.90k | £12.81k | £19.11k | £32.90k | £35.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.21k | £17.53k | £28.08k | £24.43k | £35.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 4TH OCTOBER 1983 as amended on 07 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATIONAL AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Esher Church School
Milbourne Lane
ESHER
Surrey
KT10 9DU
- Phone:
- 01372 463 139
- Email:
- yourecsa@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window