THE MICHAEL STUCKEY TRUST

Charity number: 803074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of scholarships, exhibitions, prizes,study grants, travel grants and financial assistance for students of music and without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing specifically those engaged in the study of music at King's House School, The London College of music, The Royal College of Music or who live within the Old Parish of Richmond and it's surrounding area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £3,259
Total expenditure: £900

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Richmond Upon Thames

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LINDA PODLASINSKA Trustee
None on record
MATTHEW TOBIAS Trustee
None on record
JAMES RAINBIRD Trustee
None on record
GRAEME STUCKEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.25k £2.67k £2.78k £3.22k £3.26k
Total expenditure £1.20k £1.20k £1.20k £1.50k £900
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 07 March 2024 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
40 Shaw Green Lane
Prestbury
Cheltenham
GL52 3BP
Phone:
01242245036
Website:

No information available