The Arts Society Saffron Walden

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes and advances the aesthetic education of the public, the cultivation and study of the decorative and fine arts and the giving of and to the conservation of our national artistic heritage for the benefit of the public. Member society of the National Association of Decorative and Fine Arts Societies (NADFAS)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 02 April 1990: Standard registration
- SAFFRON WALDEN DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Luis Alfonso Consejo y Radillo | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Barbara Pullen | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Elizabeth Burdett | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Rankin | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Wyld | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE SHELAGH BLEWETT | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|||||
SARAH KIRKPATRICK | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Linsell Jane Edgar | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Belinda Chambers | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Collette Irene Biggs | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.77k | £9.89k | £17.14k | £16.77k | £17.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.52k | £9.82k | £12.35k | £20.61k | £18.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST FEBRUARY 1990 AS AMENDED 22ND JUNE 1994 AND 26TH JUNE 1996 as amended on 21 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE CULTIVATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS AND THE GIVING OF AND TO THE CONSERVATION OF OUR NATIONAL ARTISTIC HERITAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
SAFFRON WALDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Edward Bawden Court
Saffron Walden
Essex
CB10 1FP
- Phone:
- 01799500436
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
theartssociety.org/saffron-walden
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window