Accounts and annual returns NAGRYS LTD

Charity number: 803104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 19 June 2023 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 19 June 2023 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 June 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 28 October 2024 912 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 June 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 23 June 2021 54 days late Download Open in new window