Financial history NAGRYS LTD

Charity number: 803104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £38.19k £76.88k £85.79k £65.17k £23
Total expenditure £12.23k £151.42k £87.18k £62.99k £8.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A