BURY ST EDMUNDS BRANCH OF THE THIRD AGE TRUST(U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bury St Edmunds U3A is a self-help group of people who are no longer in full-time paid employment. Our activities include: A monthly lecture, open to all members Specific-interest groups who meet at times of their own choosing. An annual Study Day on a nationally important topic, open to our members and other local U3As. We welcome (but do not insist on!) contributions from all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 01 May 1990: Standard registration
- U3A IN BSE (Working name)
- UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE IN BURY ST EDMUNDS (Working name)
- BURY ST EDMUNDS BRANCH OF THE THIRD AGE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Marie Pettifer | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barbara Ann Wilson | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Vera Thompson | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Patrick Burt | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Edward Patterson | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Leslie Manning | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Alice SAUL | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Kay Chapman | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rainaldo O'Meara | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.88k | £48.26k | £14.02k | £57.66k | £68.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.94k | £45.78k | £16.43k | £52.55k | £68.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 July 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 01 July 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JANUARY 1989, AS AMENDED FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND ELDERLY PEOPLE IN BURY ST. EDMUNDS AND THE SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Area of benefit
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
RISBYGATE CENTRE
90 RISBYGATE STREET
BURY ST EDMUNDS
SUFFOLK
IP33 3AA
- Phone:
- 01284 723286
- Email:
- mail@u3aburystedmunds.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window