THE CANTERBURY DISTRICT C.A.B

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing free, confidential, impartial advice to the community in the Canterbury, Herne Bay and Whitstable and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £160,728 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 26 March 1990: Standard registration
- 27 March 2020: Funds received from 1140926 KENT AND MEDWAY CITIZENS ADVICE
- CANTERBURY DISTRICT C.A.B (Working name)
- CANTERBURY DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Anne Brighton | Chair | 14 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Don Ramble | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abubakari Imoro Yakubu | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Jayne BAYLIS | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
COLIN JONES | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Taylor | Trustee | 17 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
D J CORK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Susan Record | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £465.85k | £472.80k | £447.91k | £398.20k | £477.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £449.86k | £442.50k | £461.34k | £412.57k | £489.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £160.73k | £160.73k | £40.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £120.55k | £168.92k | £160.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/03/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/04/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/02/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/11/2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN ENGLAND AND IN PARTICULAR CANTERBURY AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
CANTERBURY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canterbury Citizens Advice
3 Westgate Hall Road
CANTERBURY
CT1 2BT
- Phone:
- 01227364725
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window