Accounts and annual returns ORPHAN RELIEF FUND AND CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 803125
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 September 2020 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 01 November 2019 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 11 September 2020 | 316 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 23 January 2019 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2017
(These accounts |
09 September 2020 | 832 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window