Trustees 1ST LOCKS HEATH SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 803157

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Joseph D'Alessio | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Evans Curtis | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Kidson-Petlem | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Williams | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Winstone | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Elvin | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Adrian Jefferies | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.