Financial history THE DONAS TRUST

Charity number: 803168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.03k £6.49k £35.61k £26.25k £18.38k
Total expenditure £2.05k £5.00k £37.11k £25.75k £18.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.03k