THE SAGA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust supports the British Library Edison Fellowship programme. The programme is designed to encourage scholarship devoted to the history of recordings or western art music and music in performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 May 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Harper | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
DANIEL LEECH WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
PROFESSOR JONATHAN FREEMAN-ATTWOOD CBE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
NICK MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £1.20k | £219 | £1.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.00k | £6.50k | £2.00k | £2.00k | £9.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD APRIL 1989, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 17TH JULY 2000
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATIONAL WORK OF THE WESTERN ART MUSIC SECTION OF THE NATIONAL SOUND ARCHIVE OF THE BRITISH LIBRARY, BY COMMISSIONING LECTURES, DISCOGRAPHIES, ARTICLES AND BOOKS; AND ORGANISING SEMINARS AND EXHIBITIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Library
Boston Spa
Wetherby
LS23 7BQ
- Phone:
- 01937546451
- Email:
- claire.kitson@bl.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window