Financial history CHELMSFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 803296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £115.88k £86.43k £77.55k £80.05k £83.35k
Total expenditure £101.41k £90.58k £85.36k £78.82k £82.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A