Financial history Colchester Engagement & Next Steps Ltd

Charity number: 803328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £312.56k £301.43k £259.64k £323.51k £397.79k
Total expenditure £322.15k £174.36k £210.66k £283.59k £338.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.00k N/A N/A £500 £15.83k