Trustees Colchester Engagement & Next Steps Ltd

Charity number: 803328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Waddington Trustee 08 October 2024
THE WETHERLAM CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
GERRARD O'DRISCOLL Trustee 22 March 2023
THE WILLIE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Peter Newell Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Emily Lagadec Trustee 11 January 2021
None on record
Alison Lovesee-Collis Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record