EASTBOURNE GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society helps to promote the music of Gilbert & Sullivan. Our main activities are the annual performance of a full G & S opera, incuding some of the less well known ones, and a series of summer concerts at Eastbourne's seafront bandstand, hopefully bringing the music of G & S to visiting holidaymakers. Donations are made to nominated charities, from the proceeds of the show and the concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 16 May 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Allen | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUE DAVIS | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.11k | £2.08k | £2.35k | £14.67k | £4.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.23k | £1.11k | £2.98k | £17.77k | £5.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 October 2024 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 06 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC AND DRAMA, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS AND TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Paygate Cottages
New Road
Ringmer
LEWES
East Sussex
BN8 5HA
- Phone:
- 07738517233
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window