Financial history CITIZENS ADVICE NOTES SERVICE TRUST

Charity Number: 803343
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £174.75k £171.96k £128.62k £124.87k £118.85k
Total expenditure £200.70k £184.03k £155.21k £119.38k £119.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A