MAIDENHEAD OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the Society are the presentation of two productions each year (either musical or operatic).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 31 May 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DELIA MARGARET NICHOLSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Helen Selden | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Stone | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACQUI O'BRIEN | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MORRIS | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE SARGENT | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ELLIS | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE FRANCES SPOONER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURA JANE HOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.65k | £929 | £2.13k | £10.21k | £30.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.76k | £3.22k | £3.09k | £8.96k | £29.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH MARCH 1990 AND AS AMENDED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1992. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 MAR 2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AN APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF ALL TYPES OF OPERATIC AND MUSICAL WORKS WITHIN THE CAPABILITIES OF THE SOCIETY'S MEMBERSHIP AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME AND TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 LANCASTER ROAD
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 5EP
- Phone:
- 01628 671589
- Email:
- mail@mos-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window