Accounts and annual returns RAINFOREST ACTION FUND

Charity Number: 803372
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2017 22 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 28 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2015 30 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2015 Not Required