Financial history RAINFOREST ACTION FUND

Charity Number: 803372
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2013 01/04/2014 01/04/2015 01/04/2016 01/04/2017
Total gross income £680 £162 £125 £186 £0
Total expenditure £500 £60 £100 £100 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0