THE HAVERETTES ALL GIRLS MARCHING BRASS BAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Band takes part in local and national band contests, we appear at fetes and carnivals throughout the country. We practice 2 nights a week in a local school where the girls learn new marching routines and tunes for the forthcoming season. We actively encourage new recruits to join the band.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Havering
Governance
- 22 June 1990: Standard registration
- 05 March 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HAVERETTES GIRLS BAND (Working name)
- THE "HAVERETTES" ALL GIRLS MARCHING BRASS BAND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.18k | £6.31k | £16.48k | £1.71k | £671 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.27k | £5.92k | £7.38k | £2.93k | £5.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND INSTRUCTION FOR THE MUSICAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF GIRLS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 10 AND 21 YEARS OF AGE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAVERING AND TO HELP SUCH GIRLS THROUGH THE BAND TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED PARTICULARLY BY TRAINING THEM SO AS TO PROMOTE HABITS OF SELF DISCIPLINE AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window