THE CHANTRY HIGH SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
nil
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 01 June 1990: Standard registration
- 06 August 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16 | £876 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £113 | £85 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 09 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 09 January 2008 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 30 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 26 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
SCHOOL CATCHMENT AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window