BRITISH DIVERS MARINE LIFE RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BDMLR is an international marine animal rescue organisation, UK based. It aims to provide a rescue service for all marine wildlife, and further to provide support to existing rescue centres and develop new methods of treatment, transport and care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 1990: Standard registration
- BDMLR (Working name)
- BDMLR TURSIOPS TRADING LTD (Working name)
- BRITISH DIVERS (Working name)
- MARINE LIFE RESCUE (Working name)
- OCEAN RESCUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN PAUL KNIGHT OBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Martin Boon | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
FAYE ARCHELL | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN PARSONS | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK RICHARD STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFF HAMMOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341.47k | £347.90k | £449.20k | £397.06k | £484.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.88k | £232.58k | £302.94k | £347.11k | £445.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH FEBRUARY 1990 AS AMENDED 14 NOVEMBER 2007 (OSCR AMENDMENT) as amended on 23 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A RESCUE SERVICE FOR MARINE WILDLIFE OF ALL AND EVERY DESCRIPTION THAT MAY BE IN DANGER FROM PROBLEMS MAN-MADE OR OTHERWISE; TO MAINTAIN A TEMPORARY SHELTER FOR THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF RESCUED MARINE WILDLIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIME HOUSE
REGENCY CLOSE
UCKFIELD
EAST SUSSEX
TN22 1DS
- Phone:
- 01825767688
- Email:
- info@bdmlr.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window