YORKSHIRE ELECTRICITY GROUP BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Charity number: 803443
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 July 1990: Standard registration
- 12 October 2004: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 12 October 2004: Funds transferred to 1000443 RWE NPOWER BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON 4TH MAY 1990 AND AS AMENDED 9 JULY 2002 AND 20 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO GRANT RELIEF IN CASE OF NECESSITY IN MONEY OR KIND 1.1 TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY OR DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OR DECEASED MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF RULES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.