ELIZABETH SELBY MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The fund is used for projects which would have a long-term impact on the school. 1. It should be Additional to what the state would pay for 2. It should be Durable, and as far as possible, continue to enhance the experience of children beyond those currently in school. 3. It should be relevant and accessible to all children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 03 July 1990: Standard registration
- 11 January 2023: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.87k | £9.16k | £8.47k | £10.00k | £59.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 04 January 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 09 June 2020 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD MAY 1990
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF ELIZABETH SELBY INFANT SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window