MOON HALL SCHOOLS EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion and provision of advancement of education, particularly for dyslexic children. The Trust runs a school in Surrey which specialises in teaching dyslexic children. The school is primary and secondary up to Year 11 and GCSE and provides a full mainstream curriculum including a range of extra-curricular activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£5,161,454
Donations and legacies | £810 | |
Charitable activities | £5.14m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £16.33k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,481,543
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.48m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,065,070 from 107 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.48m | |
Retained for future use | £679.91k |
People

79 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Lambeth
- Merton
- Surrey
- Sutton
- West Sussex
Governance
- 30 May 1990: Standard registration
- BURYS COURT SCHOOL (Working name)
- MOON HALL SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Turner | Chair | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Jenkins | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alex Gear | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Grabau | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Rodney Kitley | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Newhall | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emmy Sarah Hames | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Humphries | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Fitzgibbons | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam Walford | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.41m | £3.51m | £4.39m | £4.63m | £5.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.47m | £3.14m | £3.53m | £3.87m | £4.48m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.07m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £88.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £33.88k | £89.26k | £42.47k | £34.84k | £810 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.29k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.38m | £3.42m | £4.04m | £4.60m | £5.14m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £16.33k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £307.89k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.47m | £3.14m | £3.53m | £3.87m | £4.48m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £111.09k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.87m | £1.87m | £2.17m | £3.14m | £3.49m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £958.91k | £1.49m | £2.44m | £3.26m | £2.31m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.01m | £2.17m | £2.56m | £3.59m | £2.31m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH MARCH 1990 AND AMENDED 28TH JUNE 2004.AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO CONDUCT, CARRY ON ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY BOARDING OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF EITHER SEX OR BOTH SEXES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moon Hall School
Flanchford Road
Leigh
REIGATE
RH2 8RE
- Phone:
- 01306611372
- Email:
- SchoolOffice@moonhall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window